NY S05915 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4296C
Status: Introduced on June 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4296C
Summary
Relates to confidentiality agreements; makes it unlawful for public authority to require a contract or agreement with an employee refusing to disclose any information received or learned in the course of employment except where it would be denied through published rules.
Title
Relates to confidentiality agreements; makes it unlawful for public authority to require a contract or agreement with an employee refusing to disclose any information received or learned in the course of employment except where it would be denied through published rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4296C | |
2010-03-22 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-03-18 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-03-17 | 1ST REPORT CAL.281 | |
2010-01-21 | PRINT NUMBER 5915A | |
2010-01-21 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A4296-C (Same As) 2010-04-14 - signed chap.39
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05915&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |