NY S05901 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5901E
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5901E
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing cost-of-living adjustments; increases benefits from fifty to one hundred percent.
Title
Relates to providing cost-of-living adjustments; increases benefits from fifty to one hundred percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5901E |
2020-06-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5901D |
2020-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-07-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5901C |
2019-07-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5901B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5901A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |