NY S05873 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop and conduct a public awareness campaign regarding Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop and conduct a public awareness campaign regarding Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1167
2019-06-04SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback