NY S05846 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the boards of education in union free school districts and central school districts to establish wards for the purpose of school board elections.
Title
Authorizes the boards of education in union free school districts and central school districts to establish wards for the purpose of school board elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1956 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08163 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - reported referred to ways and means