NY S05745 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5745B
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5745B
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service in certain hostilities in Afghanistan.
Title
Provides credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service in certain hostilities in Afghanistan.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5745B |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5745A |
2013-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07632 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES