NY S05730 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the description of fuel gas transmission lines.
Title
Relates to the description of fuel gas transmission lines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5730A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07589 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - REFERRED TO RULES