NY S05721 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.553
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.553
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to determining the rent increase exemption amount for individuals in a city with a population of one million or more.
Title
Relates to determining the rent increase exemption amount for individuals in a city with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.553 |
2015-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.627 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7914a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1714 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5721A |
2015-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07914 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5721a