NY S05711 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions related to the New York State Rehabilitation Association from December 31, 2023 to December 31, 2028.
Title
Extends provisions related to the New York State Rehabilitation Association from December 31, 2023 to December 31, 2028.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5518 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.617 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05518 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - signed chap.288