NY S05706 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.506
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.506
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Smithtown, to accept from the Monastery of the Glorious Ascension Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Smithtown, to accept from the Monastery of the Glorious Ascension Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.506 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1568 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5706A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.175 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.175 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-28 | Senate | print number 7560b |
2019-05-28 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-05-22 | Senate | print number 7560a |
2019-05-22 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-05-09 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7560B |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1568 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5706A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07560 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.506