NY S05690 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires form affidavit requesting affidavit ballot with contains application for registration be accepted as registration application and if the voter claims a party enrollment different from the enrollment in the records of the board of elections, such affidavit shall be treated as an application for change of enrollment.
Title
Requires form affidavit requesting affidavit ballot with contains application for registration be accepted as registration application and if the voter claims a party enrollment different from the enrollment in the records of the board of elections, such affidavit shall be treated as an application for change of enrollment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-05-28 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A6726 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to election law