NY S05675 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 5675B
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 5675B
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the training, examination and certification of dog control officers.
Title
Provides for the training, examination and certification of dog control officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-22 | PRINT NUMBER 5675B | |
2010-01-22 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE | |
2009-06-08 | PRINT NUMBER 5675A | |
2009-06-08 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE | |
2009-05-27 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A7978-C (Same As) 2010-01-12 - amended on third reading 7978c