NY S05668 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7701
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7701
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Improves insurance consumer servicing options; modernizes the methods of consumer servicing that unauthorized insurers are permitted to use, including servicing by telephone, video call, facsimile, web portal, electronic transfer of funds and other methods approved by the superintendent of financial services.
Title
Improves insurance consumer servicing options; modernizes the methods of consumer servicing that unauthorized insurers are permitted to use, including servicing by telephone, video call, facsimile, web portal, electronic transfer of funds and other methods approved by the superintendent of financial services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7701 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1162 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5668A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07701 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - signed chap.266