NY S05662 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.230
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.230
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the rate of medical assistance payments for care to recipients in hospice residences.
Title
Establishes the rate of medical assistance payments for care to recipients in hospice residences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.230 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.593 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6408a |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1490 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5662A |
2017-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06408 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5662a