NY S05659 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5659A
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5659A
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to promotions of detectives; grants detectives of the third grade and detectives of the second grade the same rights in respect to the police pension fund as detectives of a grade higher after a certain period of time.
Title
Relates to promotions of detectives; grants detectives of the third grade and detectives of the second grade the same rights in respect to the police pension fund as detectives of a grade higher after a certain period of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5659A |
2020-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1396 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07643 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - print number 7643a