NY S05649 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts of the Mount Morris central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Title
Validates certain acts of the Mount Morris central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.15 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.475 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7762 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1564 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
S01018 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A07762 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.15
A07762 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.15