NY S05627 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7750
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7750
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the provision of school age child care in school buildings shall primarily be subject to the regulations of the commissioner of education.
Title
Provides that the provision of school age child care in school buildings shall primarily be subject to the regulations of the commissioner of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7750 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1010 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07750 (Same As) 2015-12-11 - tabled