NY S05621 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the creation of a food allergy poster by the department of health; requires the posting of a food allergy poster in all food service establishments; authorizes the department to charge a fee to cover printing, postage and handling expenses of the posters.
Title
Requires the creation of a food allergy poster by the department of health; requires the posting of a food allergy poster in all food service establishments; authorizes the department to charge a fee to cover printing, postage and handling expenses of the posters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-27 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05968 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - reported referred to ways and means