NY S05600 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5600A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5600A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the contents of emergency response plans required to be submitted to the public service commission by electric corporations; requires such plans to include details of staffing, equipment, and ability to perform toward certain standards; requires the public service commission to establish a time-based restoration schedule.
Title
Relates to the contents of emergency response plans required to be submitted to the public service commission by electric corporations; requires such plans to include details of staffing, equipment, and ability to perform toward certain standards; requires the public service commission to establish a time-based restoration schedule.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5600A |
2024-03-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07166 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS