NY S05598 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certification and decertification of businesses as empire zone enterprises.
Title
Relates to certification and decertification of businesses as empire zone enterprises.
Sponsors
Sen. Darrel Aubertine [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. William Stachowski [D] | Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-01-06 | returned to senate | |
2010-01-06 | died in assembly | |
2009-07-17 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-07-16 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.946 | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-19 | PRINT NUMBER 5598B | |
2009-06-19 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-06-05 | PRINT NUMBER 5598A | |
2009-06-05 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-06-02 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-05-27 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-05-20 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A8803-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to economic development