NY S05590 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all public authorities owning, leasing, and controlling critical infrastructure to study the potential consequences of privatization.
Title
Requires all public authorities owning, leasing, and controlling critical infrastructure to study the potential consequences of privatization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09663 (Same As) 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken