NY S05573 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5573A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5573A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to energy conservation and water temperature management; requires a study to be performed on the monetary and energy savings that can be accomplished through better water temperature management.
Title
Relates to energy conservation and water temperature management; requires a study to be performed on the monetary and energy savings that can be accomplished through better water temperature management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | PRINT NUMBER 5573A | |
2010-03-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-05-19 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A8488 (Same As) 2010-03-19 - print number 8488a