NY S05567 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification requirements when a college plans to dissolve any athletic team.
Title
Relates to notification requirements when a college plans to dissolve any athletic team.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5567A |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.637 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07561 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means