NY S05566 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of educational materials regarding the misuse of and addiction to prescription drugs in counties with the most prevalent abuse of prescription opioids.
Title
Relates to the distribution of educational materials regarding the misuse of and addiction to prescription drugs in counties with the most prevalent abuse of prescription opioids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1091 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |