NY S05545 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5545A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5545A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes post-retirement earnings restrictions for New York city department of correction uniformed personnel with respect to a retiree subsequent to his or her earliest eligibility date for service retirement.
Title
Removes post-retirement earnings restrictions for New York city department of correction uniformed personnel with respect to a retiree subsequent to his or her earliest eligibility date for service retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5545A |
2014-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09393 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - referred to governmental employees