NY S05525 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5525A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5525A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires broadband providers to offer high speed broadband service to certain low-income consumers at a cost of not more than five dollars per month.
Title
Requires broadband providers to offer high speed broadband service to certain low-income consumers at a cost of not more than five dollars per month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5525A |
2022-08-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.602 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10690 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions