NY S05508 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7823B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7823B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows electronic access to a student's individualized education program.
Title
Allows electronic access to a student's individualized education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7823B |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5508B |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.501 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5508A |
2011-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2011-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07823 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - signed chap.279