NY S05500 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the adolescent suicide prevention advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the adolescent suicide prevention advisory council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.27
2017-11-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.436
2017-11-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.499
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7225b
2017-06-07Assemblyreferred to mental health
2017-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-24SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5500C
2017-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.950
2017-04-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 5500B
2017-04-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2017-04-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 5500A
2017-04-19SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2017-04-03SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

Same As/Similar To

A07225 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5500c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05500&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05500&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05500
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05500&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05500A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05500&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05500B
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05500&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05500C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5500#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5500#SF1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05500&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback