NY S05497 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to collect and report data on the early intervention program for infants and toddlers with disabilities for the purposes of improving the efficiency, cost, effectiveness and quality of such program.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to collect and report data on the early intervention program for infants and toddlers with disabilities for the purposes of improving the efficiency, cost, effectiveness and quality of such program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.270 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.286 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a7554 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1069 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07554 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - substituted by s5497