NY S05457 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the panel to adopt policies to exclude certain non-recurring items from income that would artificially inflate the availability of funds to meet current needs relating to eligibility for the program for elderly pharmaceutical insurance coverage.
Title
Authorizes the panel to adopt policies to exclude certain non-recurring items from income that would artificially inflate the availability of funds to meet current needs relating to eligibility for the program for elderly pharmaceutical insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Craig Johnson [D] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] |
Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO AGING | |
2009-06-01 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-05-07 | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A8044 (Same As) 2010-01-26 - reported referred to ways and means