NY S05447 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.512
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.512
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of election districts; provides that deployment of voting systems, election workers and election resources shall be in sufficient number to accommodate the numbers of voters eligible to vote in such polling place.
Title
Relates to the creation of election districts; provides that deployment of voting systems, election workers and election resources shall be in sufficient number to accommodate the numbers of voters eligible to vote in such polling place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-17 | SIGNED CHAP.512 | |
2010-09-07 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-28 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-28 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-28 | ordered to third reading cal.765 | |
2010-06-28 | substituted for a8692c | |
2010-06-02 | referred to election law | |
2010-06-01 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-01 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-05-10 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5447C | |
2010-04-19 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-04-14 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-04-13 | 1ST REPORT CAL.366 | |
2010-04-08 | PRINT NUMBER 5447B | |
2010-04-08 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | |
2010-03-25 | PRINT NUMBER 5447A | |
2010-03-25 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-05-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A8692-A (Same As) 2010-06-28 - substituted by s5447c