NY S05422 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to modular construction work; provides that modular construction shall comply with any existing municipal licensing requirements for all electrical, plumbing, and fire suppression work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to modular construction work; provides that modular construction shall comply with any existing municipal licensing requirements for all electrical, plumbing, and fire suppression work.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-31Assemblyreferred to labor
2023-05-31SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1033
2023-05-02SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-03-03SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A02512 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to labor

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback