NY S05328 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7612A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7612A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office for the aging to conduct a public education campaign relating to elder abuse.
Title
Authorizes the office for the aging to conduct a public education campaign relating to elder abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7612A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1176 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5328A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07612 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - tabled