NY S05313 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes persons 16 years of age or older to make an anatomical gift.
Title
Authorizes persons 16 years of age or older to make an anatomical gift.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. John Flanagan [R] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.248 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.155 |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a4990b |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-04-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.43 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5313A |
2016-01-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.826 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04990 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - substituted by s5313a