NY S05306 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7574E
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7574E
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a pilot residential parking permit system in the city of Buffalo; requires payment of fees applicable to parking within certain areas.
Title
Authorizes a pilot residential parking permit system in the city of Buffalo; requires payment of fees applicable to parking within certain areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7574E |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1107 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5306E |
2016-04-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5306D |
2016-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5306C |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5306B |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED 5306A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1222 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07574 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - signed chap.108