NY S05286 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows college coursework to be credited as a work activity which may be used toward fulfilling the employment requirements for public assistance benefits under certain conditions.
Title
Allows college coursework to be credited as a work activity which may be used toward fulfilling the employment requirements for public assistance benefits under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2022-05-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.863 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1549 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A03416 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - enacting clause stricken