NY S05267 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 13 in the county of Madison as the "Assemblyman William 'Bill' Magee Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 13 in the county of Madison as the "Assemblyman William 'Bill' Magee Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.317 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.340 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a6175b |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5267B |
2021-05-10 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-04-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5267A |
2021-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.640 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06175 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s5267b