NY S05262 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health clubs with a membership of 50 or more to have at least 1 automated external defibrillator on the premises which is accessible to the staff, members and guests.
Title
Requires health clubs with a membership of 50 or more to have at least 1 automated external defibrillator on the premises which is accessible to the staff, members and guests.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A744 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1022 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00744 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - signed chap.643