NY S05259 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state board of elections to conduct a study on the implementation and impact of ranked choice voting in New York state.
Title
Directs the state board of elections to conduct a study on the implementation and impact of ranked choice voting in New York state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1342 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |