NY S05255 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires free education for grades pre-K through undergraduate degree programs.
Title
Requires free education for grades pre-K through undergraduate degree programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-24 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08738 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary