NY S05212 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - SIGNED CHAP.202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - SIGNED CHAP.202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sprinkler system notice in residential leases.
Title
Relates to sprinkler system notice in residential leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.202 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.443 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a7641a |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.666 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5212A |
2013-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2013-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07641 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s5212a