NY S05173 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the number of barrels that a restaurant brewer may sell at retail.
Title
Expands the number of barrels that a restaurant brewer may sell at retail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5173A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A06404 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS