NY S05173 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the continuation of use of an ignition interlock device where a person upon whom such use was imposed as a condition of probation remains delinquent.
Title
Provides for the continuation of use of an ignition interlock device where a person upon whom such use was imposed as a condition of probation remains delinquent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6222 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1310 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06222 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - signed chap.440