NY S05166 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rules and regulations of the state; requires recommendations on repealing unnecessary or otherwise burdensome rules and regulations; requires the repeal of such rules or regulations by the governor.
Title
Relates to rules and regulations of the state; requires recommendations on repealing unnecessary or otherwise burdensome rules and regulations; requires the repeal of such rules or regulations by the governor.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5166A |
2014-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1033 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07986 (Same As) 2014-02-13 - print number 7986a