NY S05140 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-25 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-25 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Wantagh Memorial Congregational Church to file applications for a real property tax exemption with the county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes the Wantagh Memorial Congregational Church to file applications for a real property tax exemption with the county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | referred to real property taxation | |
2010-05-25 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-05-25 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-04-27 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-04-26 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-04-21 | 1ST REPORT CAL.420 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A8129 (Same As) 2010-06-15 - held for consideration in real property taxation