NY S05138 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4889
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4889
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4889 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.761 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04889 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.182