NY S05131 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to admission to institutions of higher education for pupils receiving home instruction; prohibits the commissioner from requiring pupils who have completed the requirements of a home school education or a non-public school program to obtain or submit proof of having obtained a general education development certificate or any accredited diploma.
Title
Relates to admission to institutions of higher education for pupils receiving home instruction; prohibits the commissioner from requiring pupils who have completed the requirements of a home school education or a non-public school program to obtain or submit proof of having obtained a general education development certificate or any accredited diploma.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1470 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1886 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5131A |
2017-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01196 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
A08969 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - referred to higher education
A08969 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - referred to higher education