NY S05120 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey a parcel of land upon the Coxsackie correctional facility to the county of Greene.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey a parcel of land upon the Coxsackie correctional facility to the county of Greene.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.325 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.396 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a7482 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1419 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07482 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - substituted by s5120