NY S05098 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensing and regulation of pet groomers; establishes standards of care, training and testing; provides such applicant must be at least sixteen years of age; provides current practitioners may continue but must be licensed within one year from effective date of legislation.
Title
Provides for the licensing and regulation of pet groomers; establishes standards of care, training and testing; provides such applicant must be at least sixteen years of age; provides current practitioners may continue but must be licensed within one year from effective date of legislation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5098A |
2015-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01451 (Same As) 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.572