NY S05096 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of prevailing market price and to preferred source subcontracts; authorizes a preferred source to subcontract an incidental portion of a contract to a vendor that is or is not a preferred source, provided that such subcontract does not diminish bona fide employment opportunities for persons who could otherwise be new clients of an entity previously accorded preferred source status.
Title
Relates to the definition of prevailing market price and to preferred source subcontracts; authorizes a preferred source to subcontract an incidental portion of a contract to a vendor that is or is not a preferred source, provided that such subcontract does not diminish bona fide employment opportunities for persons who could otherwise be new clients of an entity previously accorded preferred source status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2040 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5096C |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5096B |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5096A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.756 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06832 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means