NY S05090 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending authorization for an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax in the county of Oswego.
Title
Relates to extending authorization for an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax in the county of Oswego.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.324 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.661 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7076 |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.812 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07076 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5090